Financial history THE ISLES OF SCILLY BIRD GROUP (ISBG)

Charity number: 1103454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.27k £18.98k £8.50k £8.05k £9.41k
Total expenditure £9.03k £6.45k £7.38k £6.22k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A