OTTERY ST MARY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1101982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £11.59k £13.14k £17.72k £11.67k £11.79k
Total expenditure £12.56k £6.03k £28.09k £10.47k £7.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A