Financial history REFUGEES IN EFFECTIVE AND ACTIVE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1103345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £130.73k £99.64k £100.35k £92.50k £139.48k
Total expenditure £126.68k £105.32k £109.71k £79.13k £93.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A