Trustees DEVON DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION

Charity number: 1102233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Desmond Hemet Kumar Chair 25 November 2020
None on record
Fiona Claire Readman Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Julian Paul Davey Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
Andrew Richard North Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Harri Thorsten Ife Best Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Dr Amal Ghusain Trustee 08 January 2019
None on record
Carolyn Elizabeth Hallett Trustee 18 November 2014
None on record
Susan Barbara Kay Trustee 04 September 2007
EXETER CYCLING CAMPAIGN
Received: On time