Financial history FRIENDS OF THE PARISH OF HASLEMERE

Charity number: 1103504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.82k £9.09k £12.72k £5.81k £6.31k
Total expenditure £4.04k £845 £2.19k £11.25k £18.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A