Financial history HOPE AFRICA

Charity number: 1103478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.60k £47.22k £144.84k £97.18k £78.17k
Total expenditure £21.44k £14.19k £55.23k £49.39k £56.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A