Financial history EXETER ST. MARK CHURCH BELLS RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 1102557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £650 £607 £741 £605 £129
Total expenditure £88 £199 £91 £227 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A