THE GREAT ECCLESTON AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1104640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £197.78k £194.21k £231.07k £245.79k £7.04k
Total expenditure £179.79k £192.33k £185.91k £229.62k £54.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A