Financial history MARY SINCLAIR WATSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1104629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £15.98k £21.32k £19.44k £16.84k £11.57k
Total expenditure £27.14k £42.38k £21.48k £34.88k £9.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A