Financial history FRENCH-AFRICAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION FAWA

Charity number: 1103174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.72k £34.50k £30.78k £217.86k £69.33k
Total expenditure £24.92k £34.14k £27.11k £173.88k £85.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.00k £4.46k N/A N/A