NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HEALTH & SAFETY GROUP

Charity number: 1107325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.95k £6.72k £5.58k £8.98k £18
Total expenditure £4.48k £4.37k £3.27k £4.99k £3.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A