West Drayton Academy PTA

Charity number: 1103181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.85k £2.13k £1.12k £1.39k £1.52k
Total expenditure £1.25k £0 £431 £1.80k £722
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A