Accounts and annual returns PARENT CHEERLEADER ASSOCIATION OF THE CARSHALTON CHEERLEADERS

Charity number: 1104522
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 August 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required