Financial history SALVESON ADAPTIVE

Charity number: 1105159
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £717 £717 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £216 £216 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A