Financial history THE VITACRESS CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1103777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.50k £0 £2.50k £2.50k £2.50k
Total expenditure £2.37k £3.03k £3.81k £2.38k £2.52k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A