MISSION UDUPIDDI

Charity number: 1103941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k £1.20k
Total expenditure £1.24k £2.58k £1.27k £1.28k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A