OAKDALE INFANTS PTFA

Charity number: 1103866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.60k £20.64k £14.17k £13.71k £7.70k
Total expenditure £5.49k £16.37k £17.00k £8.16k £1.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A