Financial history CARDIFF CHAMELEONS MENCAP/ GATEWAY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1103879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £18.43k £30.28k £30.53k £26.87k £8.04k
Total expenditure £17.23k £24.43k £26.58k £23.09k £4.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A