Trustees ST PETER'S PRE-SCHOOL (STAFFORD) LTD

Charity number: 1103900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAVIS INGHAM Chair
None on record
Marie Dawson Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Hannah Mace Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Helen Carole Mace Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
HANNAH JANE JACKSON Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
JULIA HELEN EXTON Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
BECKIE TOMLINSON Trustee 19 December 2012
None on record
MR C GARDENER Trustee
None on record