Governing document THE BRITISH BLUE CATTLE SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MAY 1997, 12 MAY 1998 AND 20 JANUARY 2005. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF THE BELGIAN BLUE BREED OF LIVESTOCK AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.