ANGEL WELFARE AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1106010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £681.48k £995.26k £704.29k £618.99k £922.72k
Total expenditure £489.82k £905.87k £913.15k £467.62k £782.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £681.48k £995.26k £672.90k £618.99k £922.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £31.40k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £489.82k £905.87k £911.65k £467.62k £782.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £4.67k £2.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.50k £0 £0