Governing document ASPIRING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/10/2015 as amended on 30 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; B) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE YEMENI CULTURE; C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID YEMENI COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
DIRECTED WHOLLY OR MAINLY TO THE BENEFIT OF THE YEMENI COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.