Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE IN THREE RIVERS

Charity number: 1104392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Graham Sadler Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Emily Simonne Dunbar Trustee 07 March 2021
None on record
Ronald Sweetman Trustee 26 February 2020
HERTFORDSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE SERVICE
Overdue by 137 days
SURESH GAJJAR Trustee 22 November 2017
None on record
MARY ALDERSON Trustee 10 February 2016
None on record
ELUNED MYFANWY WALLACE Trustee
None on record
ANDREW BRIAN DOUGLAS PICKFORD Trustee
None on record
JAMES PAUL SHAW Trustee
WATFORD AND THREE RIVERS REFUGEE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time