Trustees RAGHUVANSHI MAHAJAN LONDON "RAMA"
Charity number: 1104605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJNIKANT CHHOTALAL KHIROYA | Chair | 19 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Vinodlal Manilal Kanabar | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shaneel Hirani | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kishorkumar Dayalal Ghelani | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PRAFUL RADIA | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAXMIDAS TULSIDAS POPAT | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAYENDRAKUMAR HANSRAJ MORJARIA | Trustee | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ASMITA MASRANI | Trustee | 29 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PRAKASH GANDECHA | Trustee | 19 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
RASHMI JAMNADAS CHATWANI | Trustee | 19 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
DR MANSUKH MORJARIA | Trustee | 19 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
RAJNIKANT SAMJI DAVDA | Trustee | 19 October 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.