Financial history ROUNDABOUT (WEST MIDLANDS) LIMITED

Charity number: 1104867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £148.56k £147.11k £155.31k £102.40k £182.04k
Total expenditure £136.84k £153.60k £148.94k £103.49k £153.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £5.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £24.14k £14.28k