Financial history THE BRISTOL CLIFTON AND WEST OF ENGLAND ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1104986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.61m £13.61m £12.33m £10.46m £9.82m
Total expenditure £10.57m £11.77m £11.60m £10.72m £11.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £17.37k £152.00k £587.64k £140.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.58m £2.79m £626.00k £346.00k £277.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.49m £2.37m £2.29m £806.00k £1.29m
Income - Charitable activities £8.09m £7.95m £8.89m £4.32m £8.01m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £448.00k £495.00k £526.00k £443.00k £237.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.50m £0
Income - Legacies £82.19k £242.86k £0 £20.01k £38.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.64m £9.44m £9.60m £9.50m £9.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.93m £2.33m £2.00m £1.22m £1.48m
Expenditure - Governance £93.00k £110.00k £656.00k £572.00k £1.06m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £95.00k £41.00k £68.00k £29.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0