BANNERS GATE COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity number: 1105473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £32.65k £26.68k £23.57k £36.00k £41.75k
Total expenditure £30.13k £26.52k £24.95k £22.70k £29.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A