A & M TRUST

Charity number: 1105023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £376.06k £329.64k £310.08k £136.13k £298.79k
Total expenditure £713 £1.18m £21.75k £10.77k £6.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A