Accounts and annual returns HASLINGDEN ST MARY'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1105200
Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1578 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window