Financial history THE AGAINST MALARIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1105319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £26.53m £32.22m £30.94m £77.52m £99.18m
Total expenditure £15.17m £18.02m £52.24m £74.04m £67.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £25.78m £29.99m £29.60m £77.41m £99.18m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £754.31k £2.22m £1.34m £110.73k £345.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.17m £18.02m £52.24m £74.04m £67.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.02k £10.07k £15.00k £15.00k £18.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.15m £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0