Trustees AUTISTICA
Charity number: 1107350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Boyle | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Feeney | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Copley | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Harle | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Dilnot | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Hawkins | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Hudson | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Michael Green | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Harris | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Davis | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.