Accounts and annual returns BATTERSEA POWER STATION COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1108862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 23 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 23 February 2020 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required