Trustees SWANSEA COMMUNITY BOAT TRUST
Charity number: 1105536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK WHALLEY | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stephen Clayton | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hughes | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Lewis | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Goodwin | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Brophy | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BACON | Trustee | 09 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES GLYNDWR WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.