Financial history THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106460
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £342.77k £382.11k £270.22k £254.89k £135.03k
Total expenditure £414.14k £238.05k £361.97k £303.90k £203.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A