Trustees INSTITUTE OF CONSERVATION
Charity number: 1108380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA RACHAEL CHAPLIN | Chair | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Orr | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Jordan | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Boyes | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Rheeston | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Morse | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ross | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Donald | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Georgina Davison | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Davis | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anne Stoddart | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alfred Reginald Bruce | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick Timothy Murphy | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elisabeth Fry | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sophie Wichmann Rowe | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.