Financial history Inspire Schools Educational Foundation

Charity number: 1105834
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £415.38k £468.53k £455.76k £323.77k £210.78k
Total expenditure £438.53k £511.28k £510.16k £368.91k £276.99k
Income from government contracts £16.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £146.65k £37.43k N/A £175.22k £129.14k