WIDEHORIZONS OUTDOOR EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1105847
Charity reporting is overdue by 1081 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016
Total gross income £3.16m £2.64m £2.79m £2.91m £3.12m
Total expenditure £3.08m £2.62m £2.94m £2.90m £2.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £36.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £128.11k £5.97k £232.81k £257.68k £515.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £199.26k £52.30k £75.72k £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.03m £2.43m £2.51m £2.58m £2.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £42 £46 £174 £136 £129
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.06m £2.60m £2.88m £2.84m £2.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £41.65k
Expenditure - Governance £22.46k £16.40k £20.73k £20.56k £13.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0