Financial history ZODIAC ARTS

Charity number: 1106475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.18k £19.57k £22.72k £22.50k £22.06k
Total expenditure £16.33k £20.63k £23.20k £25.11k £19.58k
Income from government contracts £2.11k N/A N/A N/A £18.72k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £2.60k N/A £2.14k