DERWENT RIVERSIDE PROJECT

Charity number: 1107237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.48k £139 £5.23k £10.12k £265
Total expenditure £1.38k £1.43k £185 £10.40k £5.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £675 N/A