Trustees NEWHAM WELFARE TRUST
Charity number: 1106501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Lucky Miah Lucky | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Saif Ahmed Saif | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Angur Miah | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Antony Britto | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aftab Ali | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
FARHANA FIRDOUS | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
WAIS UDDIN | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
NOOR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAHID CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED SHAKIB ARYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAHIDA AKTHER CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.