AFRO-SPANISH ACTION PROJECT ASAP

Charity number: 1107893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/07/2016 30/07/2017 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/07/2020
Total gross income £1.05k £1.12k £1.06k £965 £990
Total expenditure £1.01k £1.08k £1.00k £960 £950
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A