THE BRITISH POLIO FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1108335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 September 2016 On time Download