Governing document MENTORING AND BEFRIENDING FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION, DEVELOPMENT AND SUPPORT OF MENTORING AND BEFRIENDING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.