Financial history ROCK UK ADVENTURE CENTRES LIMITED

Charity number: 1107724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.13m £5.91m £3.94m £2.42m £2.54m
Total expenditure £3.12m £3.75m £4.39m £3.67m £2.53m
Income from government contracts £0 £5.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £891.32k £2.57m £132.55k £601.85k £824.87k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.36m £2.99m £326.84k £863.35k £1.62m
Income - Other trading activities £574.16k £624.11k £877.50k £408.49k £157.77k
Income - Charitable activities £2.17m £2.18m £2.70m £1.03m £748.14k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £20.64k £112.29k £27.44k £14.60k £16.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £48.76k £0 £0 £1.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.67m £3.25m £3.68m £3.34m £2.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.59k £72.73k £84.65k £49.83k £22.47k
Expenditure - Governance £18.93k £19.83k £21.02k £27.75k £33.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £402.14k £430.11k £619.80k £278.45k £91.75k