Financial history THE NORTHBOURNE PARK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1109078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £639 £639 £661 £674 £688
Total expenditure £3.32k £3.32k £404 £19 £21
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A