SOLL (VALE)

Charity number: 1107823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.50m £3.53m £3.90m £4.20m £3.72m
Total expenditure £3.67m £3.31m £3.86m £4.24m £3.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.50m £3.53m £3.90m £4.20m £3.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.67m £3.31m £3.86m £4.24m £3.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.84k £7.30k £7.30k £0 £7.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0