Financial history NAKURU ENVIRONMENTAL AND CULTURAL TRUST

Charity number: 1110361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £250 £275 £294 £150 £141
Total expenditure £570 £896 £353 £100 £73
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A