Financial history ISLAND HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1110519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £312.47k £422.25k £312.25k £208.37k £154.30k
Total expenditure £360.86k £407.06k £356.56k £279.02k £201.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £61.63k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £118.04k £179.66k £61.63k N/A £15.00k