Trustees UK AND IRELAND CONTROLLED RELEASE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1109176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helena Kelly | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Hoskins | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Gordon | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Michelle Mason | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dimitrios Lamprou | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sion Coulman | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR Maria Marlow | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KARL MALCOLM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MARGARET JAYNE LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.