Financial history PLUMPTON SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1108419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £8.59k £3.97k £829 £882 £212
Total expenditure £8.06k £2.65k £638 £127 £34
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A